U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spotted Calf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment]
  • August 21, 2018: [Request]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.