U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10087
  • Case Name: Thomas Delbert Leonhardt and Jean Louise Leonhardt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
May, 2019
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
September, 2018
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment of Social Security Number with Notice]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.