U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10086
  • Case Name: Bradley Alan Hochhalter and Melinda Rae Hochhalter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
July, 2019
  • July 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of TFR (Used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (Without Notice)]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Claim]
November, 2018
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
August, 2018
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.