U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-30049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nadeau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 21, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 24, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 06, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 28, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 27, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 27, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.