U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 25, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 14, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 21, 2021: [Consent]
  • July 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 14, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 14, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • June 09, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 03, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 14, 2021: [Dismiss Count]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2021: [Discovery]
  • April 06, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Brief]
  • March 02, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 15, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 24, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 18, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 07, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 06, 2019: [Extend]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 29, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2019: [Consent]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 26, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 23, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • September 19, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 11, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 07, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • September 07, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Request]
  • August 30, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 27, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 24, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.