U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Malcolm
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 17, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 06, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 26, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 24, 2018: [Request]
  • August 24, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.