U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown Otter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 17, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 16, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 15, 2021: [Response]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 14, 2021: [Extend]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extend]
  • December 15, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • December 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 07, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 06, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Warrant]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 11, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 24, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • August 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 24, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.