U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40413
  • Case Name: Roger Burnell Bush
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
December, 2018
  • December 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (pro se)]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.