U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40418
  • Case Name: Ehab Abdulmutta Jaber
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.