U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seaboy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 08, 2019: [Extend]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 07, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted (deactivated)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 28, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 28, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 28, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 27, 2018: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.