U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10090
  • Case Name: Jimmy Kent Peiker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
November, 2018
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Joinder]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Property]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.