U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Westphal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 22, 2020: [Forfeiture]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 10, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2019: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 06, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 06, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 23, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 13, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 07, 2019: [Response]
  • March 05, 2019: [Transcript]
  • March 04, 2019: [Supplement]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 28, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 25, 2019: [Response]
  • February 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 04, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 07, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 07, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2018: [Text Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 16, 2018: [Suppress]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 30, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 29, 2018: [Request]
  • August 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 28, 2018: [Request]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 28, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 28, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.