U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2025: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 15, 2020: [Forfeiture]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 29, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 26, 2019: [Furlough]
  • July 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 25, 2019: [Furlough]
  • July 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 24, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 12, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 08, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 15, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 29, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 11, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice]
  • November 08, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: [Consent]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Consent]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • September 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 06, 2018: [Request]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 04, 2018: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 31, 2018: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • August 31, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 31, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 31, 2018: [Request]
  • August 31, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 31, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • August 31, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 31, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 31, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.