U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-05004
  • Case Name: Allred v. Morse
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • October 07, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Default Judgment]
  • October 05, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Clerk's Entry of Default]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summons Issued]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.