U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tuttle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 17, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • July 19, 2019: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • July 19, 2019: [Statement of Facts in Support of Pretrial Diversion]
  • July 19, 2019: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2019: [Consent]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 17, 2018: [Response]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 06, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 03, 2018: [Request]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 01, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2018: [Bail Report]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.