U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Afraid Of Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 17, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 16, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 12, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 12, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 07, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 07, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 22, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • May 08, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Request]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.