U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Doe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 02, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 13, 2018: [Discovery]
  • September 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Response]
  • September 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2018: [Request]
  • September 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 05, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 05, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • September 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 05, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.