U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sena-Ambriz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 28, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Consent]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 13, 2018: [Discovery]
  • September 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2018: [Response]
  • September 05, 2018: [Request]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 04, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.