U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50203
  • Case Name: Samuel Ray VanNorman and Jamie Lynn VanNorman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 20, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
January, 2020
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Declination]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Final Report Following Conversion]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Intention]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule of Disclosures After Conversion]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule of Disclosures After Conversion]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • December 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.