U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01002
  • Case Name: Allred v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
  • October 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • October 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summons Issued]
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.