U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10092
  • Case Name: Jamie Scott Bauer and Melynda Anne Bauer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Petition with Notice]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Corrective Entry]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismissing Corporate Joint Debtor]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.