U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Max
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 21, 2019: [Extend]
  • March 21, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted (deactivated)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 15, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 15, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 11, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 10, 2018: [Request]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 03, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.