U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10093
  • Case Name: Ricky John Winge and Tricia Leigh Winge
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
February, 2020
  • February 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Denial of Discharge]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale]
  • December 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional]
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.