U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goldberg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 09, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Response]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Response]
  • April 26, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • April 07, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 04, 2022: [Compel]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extend]
  • November 08, 2021: [Response]
  • November 03, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 25, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 10, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 29, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 24, 2018: [Discovery]
  • September 14, 2018: [Response]
  • September 13, 2018: [Request]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 07, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 07, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.