U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bull Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 04, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2018: [Request]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 11, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 11, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 10, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.