U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-10032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Landers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 27, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 14, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.