U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bishop
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 09, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 04, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 04, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 22, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 19, 2019: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 15, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 15, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 26, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • March 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 04, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 01, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 25, 2018: [Request]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 18, 2018: [Request]
  • September 18, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.