U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawk Wing et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 28, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 08, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 19, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 19, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • August 12, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 06, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 27, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • January 30, 2019: [Produce ]
  • January 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 10, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 01, 2018: [Request]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 28, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 28, 2018: [Request]
  • September 27, 2018: [Request]
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 26, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.