U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 25, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 25, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 22, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 21, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 21, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 03, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 01, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2018: [Request]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 27, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 27, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 27, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2018: [Request]
  • September 27, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.