U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brave
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 08, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 08, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 19, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 20, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 18, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 18, 2018: [Request]
  • September 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.