U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dog Soldier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • September 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Request]
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 26, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 25, 2018: [Request]
  • October 24, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.