U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaRoche
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 24, 2020: [Furlough]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 14, 2020: [Furlough]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 31, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 31, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Waiver]
  • May 19, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 19, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 05, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 20, 2019: [Furlough]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 23, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 15, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 29, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 10, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 03, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Request]
  • September 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2018: [Request]
  • September 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.