U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ashley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 06, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 28, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 28, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 10, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 09, 2019: [Transcript]
  • October 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Response]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 24, 2019: [Suppress]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [Competency Report]
  • April 15, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • March 26, 2019: [Competency Evaluation]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 27, 2018: [Request]
  • November 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2018: [Request]
  • November 21, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 20, 2018: [Request]
  • November 20, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.