U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Eyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Text Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • September 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 19, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 17, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 17, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 17, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2019: [Extend]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 04, 2019: [Extend]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Brief]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 09, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 28, 2018: [Request]
  • December 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 27, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 26, 2018: [Request]
  • December 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.