U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Heck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 02, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • July 20, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 20, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 14, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 03, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 28, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 28, 2018: [Request]
  • September 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2018: [Request]
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.