U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Emery
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 21, 2022: [Forfeiture]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 19, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 12, 2022: [Appeal Record Returned]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [USCA Order]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • November 19, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 04, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 27, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 20, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 18, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 15, 2019: [Reconsideration]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 21, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2019: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 28, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • May 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 04, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 14, 2019: [Transcript]
  • March 06, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 14, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Reply]
  • February 12, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 12, 2019: [Supplement]
  • February 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [Witness List]
  • February 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 04, 2019: [Reply]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 22, 2019: [Suppress]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 22, 2018: [Request]
  • October 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 11, 2018: [Request]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 11, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 11, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 11, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.