U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2025: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 22, 2020: [Forfeiture]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • May 14, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 29, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 23, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 23, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Detainer Lodged]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 03, 2018: [Stipulation]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Request]
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 19, 2018: [Request]
  • September 19, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.