U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50208
  • Case Name: Jeffrey Lynn Fernen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
January, 2019
  • January 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.