U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brownotter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • January 24, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.