U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-04011
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Kleinsasser et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 30, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
  • October 29, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Default Judgment]
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Default Judgment]
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 16, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Entry of Default]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.