U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50210
  • Case Name: Jason Whitney Finuf and Amari Yvonne Finuf
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • October 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Affidavit of Default]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee(s) (Individual)]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.