U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50071-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez,et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 15, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 10, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 10, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 10, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extend]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Extend]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 21, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
  • April 21, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • April 21, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • April 21, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • April 21, 2021: [Court Trial - Completed]
  • April 21, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 21, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 20, 2021: [Court Trial - Began]
  • April 15, 2021: [For Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Response]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice]
  • March 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Waiver]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 09, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 05, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 09, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 02, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 01, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 01, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 22, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 22, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 22, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • March 04, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 15, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 10, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 04, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 03, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 25, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 24, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • July 24, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 22, 2019: [Objection]
  • July 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Objection]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 12, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 12, 2019: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 27, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 27, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 29, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 02, 2019: [Suppress]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 07, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • December 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 07, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • November 06, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Request]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 24, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 17, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.