U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 17, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Response]
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2018: [Request]
  • September 24, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 18, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.