U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:03-cr-40111-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Valadez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 10, 2025: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • August 18, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 12, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2019: [Extend]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 05, 2019: [Extend]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.