U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stitting Up
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Request]
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 21, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 19, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.