U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moravetz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 13, 2025: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 10, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • December 04, 2020: [Response]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • November 03, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 20, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • October 13, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • October 13, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 08, 2020: [Supplement]
  • October 07, 2020: [Text Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Admission]
  • September 30, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 22, 2020: [Extend]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 14, 2020: [Extend]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 15, 2020: [Response]
  • July 15, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 08, 2020: [Extend]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • April 22, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 21, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 13, 2020: [Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Extend]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 16, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 16, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 02, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 02, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 01, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 13, 2019: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 19, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • May 30, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 30, 2019: [Transport Defendant]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • May 07, 2019: [Transport Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 03, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 02, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 28, 2019: [Expedite ]
  • March 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 07, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
  • March 07, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 26, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2019: [Letter]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 31, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 28, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 26, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 19, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 17, 2018: [Response]
  • December 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 14, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 01, 2018: [Request]
  • November 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 29, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 26, 2018: [Response]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 26, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 22, 2018: [Request]
  • October 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 17, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 16, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 15, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 10, 2018: [Request]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 10, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Response]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 09, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • October 05, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 05, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 05, 2018: [Request]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 02, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2018: [Request]
  • September 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 20, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 19, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.