U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chase Alone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response]
  • March 12, 2025: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • January 04, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Unseal Document]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 22, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Compel]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 24, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • June 04, 2020: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • June 02, 2020: [Seal Existing Document]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 12, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 03, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 03, 2020: [Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 13, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 13, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 23, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 22, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 04, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Evaluation]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 15, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 14, 2019: [Evaluation]
  • August 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Extend]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • February 12, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • January 23, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 23, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 22, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 16, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 16, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 15, 2019: [Court Reporter Information]
  • January 15, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 15, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • January 10, 2019: [Verdict]
  • January 10, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 10, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 10, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • January 10, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 09, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • January 08, 2019: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • January 08, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 08, 2019: [Jury List]
  • January 08, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • January 07, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • January 06, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 06, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Objection]
  • December 28, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 27, 2018: [Supplement]
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 26, 2018: [Supplement]
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 26, 2018: [Response]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2018: [Status Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 29, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2018: [1 - Ex Parte Document]
  • October 03, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 19, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • September 19, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.