U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lacher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 06, 2020: [Passport - Return of]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 26, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 26, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 13, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 10, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 10, 2018: [Request]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 19, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 19, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2018: [Arrest]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.