U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brave Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 10, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 23, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 23, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 20, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.