U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buetow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • October 28, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 28, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 15, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 10, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 07, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2019: [Evaluation]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 31, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 20, 2018: [Request]
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.